House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Remove Representative Frix as principal House author and substitute with Representative McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Remove Senator Bullard as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Taylor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
HC's changed: Withdrawn from Conference Committee on Insurance and naming Special Conference Committee on Healthcare
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Bullard, Montgomery, Garvin, Quinn, Taylor, Matthews, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Frix
|
|
|