Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 12, 2022
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022
Bill April 11, 2022