ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 1 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 2360 By: Burns of the House and Hall of the Senate An Act relating to counties and county officers; amending 19 O.S. 2011, Section 130.7, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 103, O.S.L. 2015 (19 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 130.7), which relates to county government personnel education and training; requiring certain hours of training for county officers; requiring certain training for county officers elected after certain date; requiring certain training for current county o fficers; requiring certain continuing education; requiring training for county deputies; amending 19 O.S. 2011, Section 166, which relates to forfeiture of travel allowance; providing for forfeiture of monthly travel allowance for failure to complete train ing requirements; requiring written notification; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 19 O.S. 2011, Section 130.7, as amended by Section 1, Chapter 103, O.S.L. 2015 (19 O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 130.7), is amended to read as follows: Section 130.7 A. Each county commissioner, county clerk, county treasurer, and court clerk holding office on May 11, 1982 elected or appointed after November 1, 2021, and those elected ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 2 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 thereafter and the deputies of such elected county officers shall be required to participate in the appropriate training programs, as defined in subsection B of this section, and educational seminars relevant to their po sitions and duties conducted pursuant to Sections 130.1 through 130.7 of this title. In addition, county sheriffs and county assessors may attend the training programs specified in this section , within ninety (90) days after the general election of his or her first term of office, to attend and complete the orientation training provided through or approved by the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University. B. Appropriate training programs shall include those programs provided by the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University 1. Each county commissioner, county clerk and county treasurer elected or appointed after November 1, 2021, shall be required to obtain a Basic Certification by the end of his or her first term, an Advanced I Certification by the end of his or her second term, and an Advanced II Certification by the end of his or her third term prescribed by and provided through the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Servi ce at Oklahoma State University. 2. Each county commissioner, county clerk and county treasurer holding office on November 1, 2021, shall obtain: ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 3 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 a. Basic Certification by November 1, 2025, if still holding the same office, b. Advanced I Certification by November 1, 2029, if still holding the same office, and c. Advanced II Certification by November 1, 2033, if still holding the same office. C. At the discretion of the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State Universi ty, current, approved training hours accumulated through previous terms shall apply toward Basic, Advanced I and Advanced II certifications. D. 1. Each court clerk elected or appointed after November 1, 2021, shall complete the required hours to obtain h is or her certificate through the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University by the end of his or her first term. Each county assessor and county sheriff elected or appointed after November 1, 2021, shall obt ain his or her certificate through the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University by the end of his or her second term. By discretion of the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Okl ahoma State University, current, approved training hours accumulated through previous terms shall apply toward certificate hours. 2. Court clerks holding office November 1, 2021, shall complete the required hours to obtain their certificate through the C ounty ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 4 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University by November 1, 2025, if still holding the same office. Each county assessor and county sheriff holding office on November 1, 2021, shall obtain his or her certificate through the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University by November 1, 2029, if still holding the same office. By discretion of the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma Sta te University, current, approved training hours accumulated through previous terms shall apply toward certificate hours. E. Upon completion of the requirements in subsections A through D of this section, each county commissioner, county clerk, county treasurer and county court clerk shall be required to attend six (6) hours of continuing education per calendar year through or approved by the County Training Program of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University. F. The deputies of each elected county officer shall participate in the training and educational seminars relevant to their positions and duties . SECTION 2. AMENDATORY 19 O.S. 2011, Section 166, is amended to read as follows: Section 166. A. Failure of a county officer to attend any school, conference or meeting unless excused prior thereto shall cause the county officer to forfeit his or her right to the monthly ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 5 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 travel allowance provided by Section 165 of this title for the month in which such school, conference or meeting is held. The directing state officer or agency head shall notify the county clerk of the county of the forfeiture of such county officer. B. Any county commissioner, county treasurer, county clerk, county sheriff or county court cl erk who fails to complete the training requirements as outlined in Section 130.7 of this title shall, but not limited to, forfeit his or her right to receive the monthly travel allowance provided by Section 165 of this title or any other penalties authoriz ed by law. C. The County Training Program Director of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University shall send written notification of noncompliance to the county clerk of the county, the board of county commissioners and the State Audito r and Inspector. Upon such notification, the board of county commissioners shall not approve payment of the monthly travel allowance for said county officer. The monthly travel allowance may be reinstated the following month once the county officer becom es compliant with the training requirements. The County Training Program Director of the Cooperative Extension Service at Oklahoma State University shall send written notification to the county clerk of the county, the board of county commissioners and th e State Auditor and Inspector when a county officer reestablishes compliance with the training requirements. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 6 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 D. Any county, county officer or deputy may join his or her respective state, national or international association, including but not limited to, the National Association of Counties, the International Association of Assessors and the International Association of Clerks, Recorders, Election Officials and Treasurers. It shall not be mandatory for a county officer or his or her deputy to attend any meeting, school, institute or conference sponsored or held by anyone other than a state officer or agency head, but if funds are available for travel to such meeting, school, institute or conference, either within or outside this state, from funds appropriated for traveling expenses in addition to the monthly travel allowance provided by Section 165 of this title, then it shall be lawful for such traveling expenses to be paid from such travel funds so appropriated to the county officer or his or her deputies. SECTION 3. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. SECTION 4. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. ENGR. H. B. NO. 2360 Page 7 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 Passed the House of Representatives the 3rd day of March, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________ , 2021. Presiding Officer of the Senate