Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 10 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Mize, Cornwell | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Burns |