House
|
05/12/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/12/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
SA's considered
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 19 Nays: 25
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Pittman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bell
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Government Modernization and Efficiency Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Efficiency
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Burns
|
|
|