Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2365 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 10, 2021

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 8, 2021