Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife | ||
House | 03/21/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Remove Representative Kerbs as principal House author and substitute with Representative Grego | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Remove Representative Burns as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Burns |