House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 27
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Remove Representative Davis as principal House author and substitute with Representative Marti
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Davis
|
|
|