House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 20
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Ayes: 52 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Luttrell
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Russ
|
|
|