House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, Townley, Grego, Boles, Fetgatter, Lepak, Stark, Gann, Dills, Steagall, McDugle, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader, Smith, Stearman, Olsen, West (Kevin), Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Russ
|
|
|