Senate | 03/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 03/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Bell | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2021 | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) |