Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Amended | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Frix |