Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 14, 2022
Bill March 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 1, 2021