Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2501 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021