House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Kannady
|
|
|