Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | An Act | |
2 | - | ENROLLED HOUSE | |
1 | + | ||
2 | + | ||
3 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR Page 1 | |
4 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
5 | + | 2 | |
6 | + | 3 | |
7 | + | 4 | |
8 | + | 5 | |
9 | + | 6 | |
10 | + | 7 | |
11 | + | 8 | |
12 | + | 9 | |
13 | + | 10 | |
14 | + | 11 | |
15 | + | 12 | |
16 | + | 13 | |
17 | + | 14 | |
18 | + | 15 | |
19 | + | 16 | |
20 | + | 17 | |
21 | + | 18 | |
22 | + | 19 | |
23 | + | 20 | |
24 | + | 21 | |
25 | + | 22 | |
26 | + | 23 | |
27 | + | 24 | |
28 | + | ||
29 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION | |
30 | + | April 5, 2021 | |
31 | + | ||
32 | + | ||
33 | + | ENGROSSED HOUSE | |
3 | 34 | BILL NO. 2511 By: Kannady of the House | |
4 | 35 | ||
5 | 36 | and | |
6 | 37 | ||
7 | 38 | Howard of the Senate | |
39 | + | ||
40 | + | ||
8 | 41 | ||
9 | 42 | ||
10 | 43 | ||
11 | 44 | ||
12 | 45 | An Act relating to tobacco and vapor products; | |
13 | 46 | requiring vapor product manufacturers to make a | |
14 | 47 | certain attestation to the Alcoholic Beverage Laws | |
15 | 48 | Enforcement Commission; providing for contents of the | |
16 | 49 | attestation; requiring notification of material | |
17 | 50 | changes to the attestation; requiring the ABLE | |
18 | 51 | Commission to develop, publish, and maintain a | |
19 | 52 | certain directory; prohibiting certain acts; | |
20 | 53 | providing for codification; and p roviding an | |
21 | 54 | effective date. | |
22 | 55 | ||
23 | 56 | ||
24 | 57 | ||
25 | - | SUBJECT: Tobacco and vapor products | |
26 | 58 | ||
27 | 59 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: | |
28 | - | ||
29 | 60 | SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified | |
30 | 61 | in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1-229.35 of Title 63, unless | |
31 | 62 | there is created a duplica tion in numbering, reads as follows: | |
32 | - | ||
33 | 63 | A. Beginning July 1, 2022, every manufacturer of a vapor | |
34 | 64 | product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether | |
35 | - | directly or through a distributor, | |
65 | + | directly or through a distributor, reta iler or similar intermediary | |
36 | 66 | or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under | |
37 | 67 | penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Laws | |
68 | + | ||
69 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR Page 2 | |
70 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
71 | + | 2 | |
72 | + | 3 | |
73 | + | 4 | |
74 | + | 5 | |
75 | + | 6 | |
76 | + | 7 | |
77 | + | 8 | |
78 | + | 9 | |
79 | + | 10 | |
80 | + | 11 | |
81 | + | 12 | |
82 | + | 13 | |
83 | + | 14 | |
84 | + | 15 | |
85 | + | 16 | |
86 | + | 17 | |
87 | + | 18 | |
88 | + | 19 | |
89 | + | 20 | |
90 | + | 21 | |
91 | + | 22 | |
92 | + | 23 | |
93 | + | 24 | |
94 | + | ||
38 | 95 | Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of the date of | |
39 | 96 | such attestation: | |
40 | - | ||
41 | 97 | 1. The vapor product was available for purchase in the United | |
42 | 98 | States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a | |
43 | 99 | marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket | |
44 | 100 | Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the | |
45 | 101 | United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or | |
46 | - | ENR. H. B. NO. 2511 Page 2 | |
47 | 102 | 2. The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other | |
48 | 103 | authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section | |
49 | 104 | 387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. | |
50 | - | ||
51 | 105 | B. The manufacturer shall notify the ABL E Commission within | |
52 | - | thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, | |
53 | - | including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or | |
54 | - | other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the | |
55 | - | vapor product, either temporarily or permanently, from the United | |
56 | - | States market. | |
57 | - | ||
106 | + | thirty (30) days of any material ch ange to the attestation including | |
107 | + | whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or other | |
108 | + | authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the vapor | |
109 | + | product, either temporarily or perm anently, from the United States | |
110 | + | market. | |
58 | 111 | C. The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of | |
59 | 112 | the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with | |
60 | 113 | subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed | |
61 | 114 | in such attestations. The ABLE Commission shall: | |
62 | - | ||
63 | 115 | 1. Make the director y available for public inspection on its | |
64 | 116 | website on or before October 1, 2022; and | |
117 | + | ||
118 | + | SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR Page 3 | |
119 | + | (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 | |
120 | + | 2 | |
121 | + | 3 | |
122 | + | 4 | |
123 | + | 5 | |
124 | + | 6 | |
125 | + | 7 | |
126 | + | 8 | |
127 | + | 9 | |
128 | + | 10 | |
129 | + | 11 | |
130 | + | 12 | |
131 | + | 13 | |
132 | + | 14 | |
133 | + | 15 | |
134 | + | 16 | |
135 | + | 17 | |
136 | + | 18 | |
137 | + | 19 | |
138 | + | 20 | |
139 | + | 21 | |
140 | + | 22 | |
141 | + | 23 | |
142 | + | 24 | |
65 | 143 | ||
66 | 144 | 2. Update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes and to | |
67 | 145 | add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to main tain the | |
68 | 146 | directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. | |
69 | - | ||
70 | 147 | D. It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly, | |
71 | - | to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter | |
148 | + | to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter or furnish in | |
72 | 149 | this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory. | |
73 | - | ||
74 | 150 | SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. | |
75 | - | ENR. H. B. NO. 2511 Page 3 | |
76 | - | Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2021. | |
77 | - | ||
78 | - | ||
79 | - | ||
80 | - | ||
81 | - | Presiding Officer of the House | |
82 | - | of Representatives | |
83 | - | ||
84 | - | ||
85 | - | Passed the Senate the 19th day of April, 2021. | |
86 | - | ||
87 | - | ||
88 | - | ||
89 | - | ||
90 | - | Presiding Officer of the Senate | |
91 | - | ||
92 | - | ||
93 | - | OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR | |
94 | - | Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ | |
95 | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
96 | - | By: _________________________________ | |
97 | - | Approved by the Gove rnor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ | |
98 | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
99 | - | ||
100 | - | ||
101 | - | _________________________________ | |
102 | - | Governor of the State of Oklahoma | |
103 | - | ||
104 | - | OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE | |
105 | - | Received by the Office of the Secret ary of State this __________ | |
106 | - | day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. | |
107 | - | By: _________________________________ | |
108 | - | ||
151 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES | |
152 | + | April 5, 2021 - DO PASS |