Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2511 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/01/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 7805 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2511 	By: Kannady 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to tobacco and vapor products; 
requiring vapor product manufacturers to make a 
certain attestation to the Alcoholic Beverage Laws 
Enforcement Commission; providing for contents of the 
attestation; requiring notification of material 
changes to the attestation; requiring the ABLE 
Commission to develop, publish, and maintain a 
certain directory; prohibiting certain acts; 
providing for codification; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1-229.35 of Title 63, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  Beginning July 1, 2022, every manufacturer of a vapor 
product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether 
directly or through a distributor, retailer, or similar intermediary 
or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under 
penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Laws   
 
Req. No. 7805 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of the date of 
such attestation: 
1.  The vapor product was available for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a 
marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, t o the 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
B.  The manufacturer sh all notify the ABLE Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or 
other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either t emporarily or permanently, from the United 
States market. 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are liste d 
in such attestations.  The ABLE Commission shall: 
1.  Make the directory available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2022; and   
 
Req. No. 7805 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or vapo r products to maintain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly, 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter, or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that i s not included in the directory. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-7805 JL 02/25/21