Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2511 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 5, 2021 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2511 	By: Kannady of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Howard of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to tobacco and vapor products; 
requiring vapor product manufacturers to make a 
certain attestation to the Alcoholic Beverage Laws 
Enforcement Commission; providing for contents of the 
attestation; requiring notification of material 
changes to the attestation; requiring the ABLE 
Commission to develop, publish, and maintain a 
certain directory; prohibiting certain acts; 
providing for codification; and p roviding an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1-229.35 of Title 63, unless 
there is created a duplica tion in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  Beginning July 1, 2022, every manufacturer of a vapor 
product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether 
directly or through a distributor, reta iler or similar intermediary 
or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under 
penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Laws   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of the date of 
such attestation: 
1.  The vapor product was available for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a 
marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the ABL E Commission within 
thirty (30) days of any material ch ange to the attestation including 
whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or other 
authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the vapor 
product, either temporarily or perm anently, from the United States 
market. 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed 
in such attestations.  The ABLE Commission shall: 
1.  Make the director y available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2022; and   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2511 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  Update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to main tain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly, 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included in the directory. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES 
April 5, 2021 - DO PASS