Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2511 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/20/2021

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2511 	By: Kannady of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Howard of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to tobacco and vapor products; 
requiring vapor product manufacturers to make a 
certain attestation to the Alcoholic Beverage Laws 
Enforcement Commission; providing for contents of the 
attestation; requiring notification of material 
changes to the attestation; requiring the ABLE 
Commission to develop, publish, and maintain a 
certain directory; prohibiting certain acts; 
providing for codification; and pr oviding an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Tobacco and vapor products 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 1 -229.35 of Title 63, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
 
A.  Beginning July 1, 2022, every manufacturer of a vapor 
product that is sold or intended to be sold in this state, whether 
directly or through a distributor, retailer, or similar intermediary 
or intermediaries, shall execute and deliver an attestation under 
penalty of perjury to the Oklahoma Alcoholic Beverage Laws 
Enforcement (ABLE) Commission certifying that, as of the date of 
such attestation: 
 
1.  The vapor product was availabl e for purchase in the United 
States as of August 8, 2016, and the manufacturer has applied for a 
marketing order for the vapor product by submitting a Premarket 
Tobacco Product Application on or before September 9, 2020, to the 
United States Food and Drug Administration (FDA); or 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2511 	Page 2 
2.  The manufacturer has received a marketing order or other 
authorization for the vapor product from the FDA pursuant to Section 
387j of Title 21 of the United States Code. 
 
B.  The manufacturer shall notify the ABLE Commission w ithin 
thirty (30) days of any material change to the attestation, 
including whether the FDA has issued or not issued a market order or 
other authorization or has ordered the manufacturer to remove the 
vapor product, either temporarily or permanently, from the United 
States market. 
 
C.  The ABLE Commission shall develop a directory listing all of 
the manufacturers that have provided attestations that comply with 
subsection A of this section and all vapor products that are listed 
in such attestations.  The AB LE Commission shall: 
 
1.  Make the directory available for public inspection on its 
website on or before October 1, 2022; and 
 
2.  Update the directory as necessary to correct mistakes and to 
add or remove manufacturers or vapor products to maintain the 
directory in conformity with the requirements of this section. 
 
D.  It shall be unlawful for any person, directly or indirectly, 
to knowingly manufacture, distribute, sell, barter, or furnish in 
this state any vapor product that is not included in the direct ory. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2511 	Page 3 
Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 19th day of April, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Gove rnor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secret ary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________