House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 59 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |