House
|
05/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Conference granted, SCs named Taylor, Leewright, Paxton, McCortney, Pugh, Brooks
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|