House | 02/25/2021 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Echols | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |