House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McBride
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Boatman
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Cornwell, Caldwell (Chad), Kendrix, Dills, Grego, Boles, Conley, Gann, Mize, Stark, Russ, Roberts (Eric), Roberts (Sean), McDugle, Caldwell (Trey), Bashore, Wolfley, Moore, West (Tammy), Miller, Smith, Dempsey, Baker, Lepak, McCall, Sims, Lawson, Williams, Roe, Humphrey, ODonnell, Phillips, Manger
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols, Hardin (David), Townley, Burns
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative Hill
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
CR; Do Pass States Rights Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to States Rights
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Echols
|
|
|