Senate | 03/29/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Echols |