House
|
05/04/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Trey), Fugate, West (Tammy), Dollens, Davis, Sneed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Marti
|
|
|