House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Townley, Boles
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|