House
|
05/10/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/10/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2021
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|