House
|
04/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|