Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2692 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/21/2021

                             
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
HOUSE BILL 2692 	By: Hasenbeck 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to schools; creating the Advanced 
Roles for Teachers and School Leaders Act; 
establishing a pilot program; providing p rogram 
purposes; directing the State Board of Education to 
develop program standards; requiring request for 
proposals; setting deadlines; listing eligibility for 
schools chosen to participate in program; requiring 
implementation of program at selected scho ols for a 
certain school year; providing for expenditures; 
directing evaluation and report on program; requiring 
local boards of education to provide requested 
information; providing exemptions for selected 
schools; providing for codification; and providin g an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6 -221 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplicat ion in numbering, reads as follows: 
This act shall be known and may be cited as the "Advanced Roles 
for Teachers and School Leaders Act ".   
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6 -222 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  The State Board of Education shall establish a three -year 
pilot program for advanced teaching roles and organizational models 
in schools.  The purposes of the pilot program shall be to: 
1.  Support advanced roles for teachers who wish to stay in the 
classroom; 
2.  Recognize teachers who demonstrate advanced roles in the 
classroom through increased compensation; 
3.  Provide teachers with personalized professional develo pment 
to support attainment of lead and master teacher certificates 
pursuant to Section 6 -190 of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
4.  Increase the recruitment and retention of teachers -in-
training and beginning classroom teachers; 
5.  Allow principals to expand their leaderships capabilities; 
and 
6.  Support improved student outcomes. 
B. On or before December 31, 2021 , the Board shall develop 
standards for the pilot program. The standards shall include, but 
shall not be limited to: 
1.  School organizational models that utilize advanced teaching 
roles to deliver data -driven instruction and improve schoolwide 
performance;   
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  An enhanced salary schedule for teachers who demonstrate 
advanced roles in the classroom; 
3.  Professional development opportunities for teachers to 
facilitate advancement in the classroom pursuant to the requirements 
for lead and master teacher certificates as specified in Section 6 -
190 of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes ; 
4.  A specialized teacher residency program to support the 
recruitment and retention of future high -quality classroom teachers; 
and 
5.  Specialized principal training cohorts to support the 
recruitment and retention of new school leaders and expand the 
leadership capabilities of existing school leaders. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6 -223 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  On or before January 31, 2022 , the State Board of Education 
shall issue a request for p roposals to schools for the pilot program 
created in Section 2 of this act. 
B.  Schools wishing to participate in the pilot program shall 
submit their proposals to the B oard on or before March 31, 2022 . 
C.  On or before May 31, 2 022, the Board shall select at least 
ten schools to participate in the pilot program, including:   
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  At least two schools in local school districts with an 
average daily membership of at least fifteen thousand (15,000) 
students; 
2.  At least two schools in local school districts with an 
average daily membership between two thousand (2,000) and twenty 
thousand (20,000) students; and 
3.  At least two schools in local school districts with an 
average daily membership of less than two thousand (2,000) students. 
D.  The selected pilot schools shall begin implementation of the 
pilot program beginning with the 2022 -2023 school year. 
SECTION 4.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6 -224 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
Funds appropriated for pilot program implementation may be 
expended for, but shall not be limited to, the following purposes: 
1.  Salary supplements for advanced teaching roles; 
2.  Development of advanced teaching role plans; 
3.  Development of professional development courses that support 
advanced teaching roles; 
4.  Transition costs associated with designing and implementing 
advanced teaching role models in schools; 
5.  Development of the design and implementation of compensation 
plans that focus on teacher professional growth and student outcomes   
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
and the transition costs associated with designing and implementing 
new compensation plans; 
6.  Developing and implementing a specialized tea cher residency 
program; 
7.  Developing and implementing a specialized principal training 
cohort; and 
8.  Retaining staff members or contractors to assist with the 
design and implementation of the pilot program. 
SECTION 5.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6 -225 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  On or before December 31, 2025 , the State Board of Education 
shall evaluate the pilot program and issue a report on the extent to 
which the pilot program has contributed to: 
1.  An improvement in the quality of classroom instruction and 
student growth; 
2.  An increase in the recruitment of high -quality classroom 
teachers; 
3.  Assistance to and ret ention of beginning classroom teachers; 
4.  The recognition, impact and retention of high -quality 
classroom teachers; and 
5.  Improvements in the quality and leadership impact of school 
principals.   
 
Req. No. 6173 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  Local boards of education for selected pilot schools s hall 
provide any requested information to the State Board of Education 
for the purposes of evaluation pursuant to subsection A of this 
section. 
SECTION 6.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Secti on 6-226 of Title 70, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
Schools selected by the State Board of Education for the pilot 
program may be exempt from: 
1.  The local school district compensation schedule as specified 
in Section 5-141 of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes; provided, 
however, the modifications are to provide increased compensation for 
teachers who demonstrate advanced roles in the classroom and meet 
the minimum statewide salary schedule specified in Section 18 -114.14 
of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes; and 
2.  Limitations on class size as specified in Section 18 -113.1 
of Title 70 of the Oklahoma Statutes; provided, however, the classes 
are under the leadership of a lead or master teacher and are part of 
a larger effort to implement new instructional models to improve 
schoolwide performance. 
SECTION 7.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
58-1-6173 EK 12/17/20