House
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 16
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Remove Representative Hasenbeck as principal House author and substitute with Representative Williams
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Pemberton, Stanley, Taylor, Newhouse, Dossett (J.A.), Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Stanley; authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Nollan
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 11
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Rosecrants, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills, Russ, Sterling
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Waldron, McBride, Rosecrants, Talley
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|