Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2748 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021