Senate | 04/06/2021 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Withdrawn from Education committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 31 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Remove Representative Baker as principal House author and substitute with Representative Echols | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Baker |