Senate | 04/06/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |