House
|
04/15/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/15/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Pfeiffer
|
|
|