House
|
05/18/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/18/2021
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|