House
|
04/22/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/22/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson, Russ, Blancett
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|