Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2866 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 18, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2021