Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2904 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 8326 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2904 	By: Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House   
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate   
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the State Departm ent of Health; 
requiring that portions of certain appropriated funds 
be used for certain purposes; stating purpose of 
certain disbursement; requiring the use of certain 
data; directing the Department to develop method of 
disbursement; authorizing promulgat ion of rules; 
requiring the employment of certain positions by 
certain date; authorizing the establishment of 
qualifications; providing exception; providing for 
lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring 
certain budget procedures; and prohibiting c ertain 
budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislatur e, the sum of Fifty Thousand Dollars 
($50,000.00) shall be used for increased sickle cell outreach.   
 
Req. No. 8326 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Two Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($200,000.00) shall be used for the operations of the Oklahoma 
Athletic Commission, pursuant to the provisions of the Oklahoma 
State Athletic Commission Act. 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Three Million Dollars 
($3,000,000.00) shall be used for the continuation of the Choosing 
Childbirth Act by th e provisions listed in Section 1 -740.15 et seq. 
of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes. 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the State Department 
of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 
58th Oklahoma Legislat ure, One Million Nine Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($1,900,000.00) shall be disbursed to health centers authorized 
under Section 330 of the Public Health Services Act, and 
incorporated in the State of Oklahoma.  Any disbursement shall be 
for the purpose of inc reasing access to primary health care which 
may include medical, dental, and or mental health and substance 
abuse treatment services in or near designated Medically Underserved 
Areas or Medically Underserved Populations.  Any disbursement for 
increased access to primary health care services shall be supported 
by data according to proportions of patient volume and access for   
 
Req. No. 8326 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
uninsured.  The method of disbursement shall be developed by the 
State Department of Health.  The State Commissioner of Health is 
authorized to promulgate the method of disbursement into rules. 
SECTION 5.  A.  From the funds available for budgeting and 
expenditure during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, the State 
Department of Health shall utilize an amount necessary to hire and 
employ, in addition to current staffing, the following positions at 
the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority: 
1.  Sixty-two compliance and enforcement positions; 
2.  Six positions to perform legal and financial duties; 
3.  Four investigatory of ficers; and 
4.  Four positions to perform planning and logistics duties. 
B.  The Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority shall establish the 
qualifications and salary for each position described in subsection 
A of this section, provided that at least five (5) years of 
experience in criminal investigation shall be required for an 
investigatory officer position. 
C.  The positions described in this section shall be hired no 
later than December 1, 2021, and all such hires shall be provided 
all tools, technology an d vehicles required to perform their duties, 
within thirty (30) days of the beginning of their employment. 
SECTION 6.  Appropriations made by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 
of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for   
 
Req. No. 8326 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only throug h June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
58-1-8326 JM 05/17/21