Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2904 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-An Act
2-ENROLLED HOUSE
1+
2+
3+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 1 1
4+2
5+3
6+4
7+5
8+6
9+7
10+8
11+9
12+10
13+11
14+12
15+13
16+14
17+15
18+16
19+17
20+18
21+19
22+20
23+21
24+22
25+23
26+24
27+
28+ENGROSSED HOUSE
329 BILL NO. 2904 By: Wallace and Hilbert of the
430 House
531
632 and
733
834 Thompson and Hall of the
935 Senate
1036
1137
1238
1339
1440
1541
1642 An Act relating to the State Department of Health;
1743 requiring that portions of certain appropriated funds
1844 be used for certain purposes; stating purpose of
1945 certain disbursement; requiring the use of certain
2046 data; directing the Department to develop method of
2147 disbursement; authorizing promulgation of rules;
2248 requiring the employment of certain positions by
2349 certain date; authorizing the establ ishment of
2450 qualifications; providing exception; providing for
2551 lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring
2652 certain budget procedures; and prohibiting certain
2753 budget procedures.
2854
2955
3056
3157
32-SUBJECT: State Department of Health
33-
3458 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:
35-
3659 SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the State Department
3760 of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the
3861 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Fifty Thousand Dollars
3962 ($50,000.00) shall be used for increased sickle cell outreach.
40-
4163 SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the State Department
4264 of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the
4365 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Two Hundred Thousand Dollars
4466 ($200,000.00) shall be used for the oper ations of the Oklahoma
67+
68+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 2 1
69+2
70+3
71+4
72+5
73+6
74+7
75+8
76+9
77+10
78+11
79+12
80+13
81+14
82+15
83+16
84+17
85+18
86+19
87+20
88+21
89+22
90+23
91+24
92+
4593 Athletic Commission, pursuant to the provisions of the Oklahoma
46-State Athletic Commission Act. ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 2
47-
94+State Athletic Commission Act.
4895 SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated to the State Department
4996 of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Sessi on of the
5097 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Three Million Dollars
5198 ($3,000,000.00) shall be used for the continuation of the Choosing
5299 Childbirth Act by the provisions listed in Section 1 -740.15 et seq.
53100 of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes.
54-
55101 SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the State Department
56102 of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the
57103 58th Oklahoma Legislature, One Million Nine Hundred Thousand Dollars
58104 ($1,900,000.00) shall be disbursed to health centers authorized
59105 under Section 330 of the Public Health Services Act, and
60106 incorporated in the State of Oklahoma. Any disbursement shall be
61107 for the purpose of increasing access to primary health care which
62108 may include medical, dental, and /or mental health and s ubstance
63109 abuse treatment services in or near designated Medically Underserved
64110 Areas or Medically Underserved Populations. Any disbursement for
65111 increased access to primary health care services shall be supported
66112 by data according to proportions of patient volume and access for
67113 the uninsured. The method of disbursement shall be developed by the
68114 State Department of Health. The State Commissioner of Health is
69115 authorized to promulgate the method of disbursement into rules.
70116
117+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 3 1
118+2
119+3
120+4
121+5
122+6
123+7
124+8
125+9
126+10
127+11
128+12
129+13
130+14
131+15
132+16
133+17
134+18
135+19
136+20
137+21
138+22
139+23
140+24
141+
71142 SECTION 5. A. From the funds available for budgeting and
72143 expenditure during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, the State
73144 Department of Health shall utilize an amount necessary to hire and
74145 employ, in addition to current staffing, the following positions at
75146 the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority:
76-
77147 1. Sixty-two compliance and enforcement positions;
78-
79148 2. Six positions to perform legal and financial duties;
80-
81149 3. Four investigatory officers; and
82-
83150 4. Four positions to perform planning and logistics duties.
84-
85151 B. The Oklahoma Medic al Marijuana Authority shall establish the
86152 qualifications and salary for each position described in subsection
87153 A of this section, provided that at least five (5) years of
88154 experience in criminal investigation shall be required for an
89155 investigatory officer p osition.
90- ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 3
91156 C. The positions described in this section shall be hired no
92157 later than December 1, 2021, and all such hires shall be provided
93158 all tools, technology and vehicles required to perform their duties,
94159 within thirty (30) days of the beginning of their employment.
95-
96160 SECTION 6. Appropriations made by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900
97161 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including
98162 appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for
99163 the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be
100164 budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).
101165 Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30,
166+
167+ENGR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 4 1
168+2
169+3
170+4
171+5
172+6
173+7
174+8
175+9
176+10
177+11
178+12
179+13
180+14
181+15
182+16
183+17
184+18
185+19
186+20
187+21
188+22
189+23
190+24
191+
102192 2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022. Any funds
103193 remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall
104194 lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal
105195 year. Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June
106196 30, 2023. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse
107197 to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.
108198 These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years
109199 simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay
110200 obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after
111201 the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared
112202 and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds
113203 from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been
114204 approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Servi ces.
115- ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 4
116-
117205 Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2021.
118206
119207
120208
121209
122210 Presiding Officer of the House
123211 of Representatives
124212
125213
126-Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2021.
214+Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021.
127215
128216
129217
130218
131219 Presiding Officer of the Senate
132220
133221
134-
135-OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR
136-Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________
137-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
138-By: _________________________________
139-Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma thi s _________
140-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
141-
142-
143- _________________________________
144- Governor of the State of Oklahoma
145-
146-OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE
147-Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________
148-day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M.
149-By: _________________________________