An Act ENROLLED HOUSE BILL NO. 2904 By: Wallace and Hilbert of the House and Thompson and Hall of the Senate An Act relating to the State Department of Health; requiring that portions of certain appropriated funds be used for certain purposes; s tating purpose of certain disbursement; requiring the use of certain data; directing the Department to develop method of disbursement; authorizing promulgation of rules; requiring the employment of certain positions by certain date; authorizing the establi shment of qualifications; providing exception; providing for lapse of funds under certain conditions; requiring certain budget procedures; and prohibiting certain budget procedures. SUBJECT: State Department of Health BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF TH E STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. From the funds appropriated to the State Department of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Fifty Thousand Dollars ($50,000.00) shall be use d for increased sickle cell outreach. SECTION 2. From the funds appropriated to the State Department of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Two Hundred Thousand Dollars ($200,000.00) shall be used for the operations of the Oklahoma Athletic Commission, pursuant to the provisions of the Oklahoma State Athletic Commission Act. ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 2 SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated to the State Department of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Three Million Dollars ($3,000,000.00) shall be used for the continuation of the Choosing Childbirth Act by the provisions listed in Section 1 -740.15 et seq. of Title 63 of the Oklahoma Statutes. SECTION 4. From the funds appropriated to the State Department of Health in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, One Million Nine Hundred Thousand Dollars ($1,900,000.00) shall be disbursed to health centers authorized under Section 330 of the Public Health Services Act, and incorporated in the State of Oklahoma. Any disbursement shall be for the purpose of increasing access to primary health care which may include medical, dental, and/or mental health and substance abuse treatment services in or near designated Medically Underserved Areas or Medically Underserved Populations. Any disbursement for increased access to primary health care services shall be supported by data according to proportions of patient volume and access for the uninsured. The method of disbursement shall be developed by the State Department of Health. The State Commissioner of Health is authorized to promulgate the method of disbursement into rul es. SECTION 5. A. From the funds available for budgeting and expenditure during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022, the State Department of Health shall utilize an amount necessary to hire and employ, in addition to current staffing, t he following positions at the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority: 1. Sixty-two compliance and enforcement positions; 2. Six positions to perform legal and financial duties; 3. Four investigatory officers; and 4. Four positions to perform planning and logistics duties. B. The Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority shall establish the qualifications and salary for each position described in subsection A of this section, provided that at least five (5) years of experience in criminal investigation sh all be required for an investigatory officer position. ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 3 C. The positions described in this section shall be hired no later than December 1, 2021, and all such hires shall be provided all tools, technology and vehicles required to perform their duties, within thirty (30) days of the beginning of their employment. SECTION 6. Appropriations made by Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, not including appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23). Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2022, and must be expended by Novemb er 15, 2022. Any funds remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 30, 2023. Any funds remaini ng after November 15, 2023, shall lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year. These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years simultaneously. Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. ENR. H. B. NO. 2904 Page 4 Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2021. Presiding Officer of the House of Representatives Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2021. Presiding Officer of the Sen ate OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________ Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma thi s _________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. _________________________________ Governor of the State of Oklahoma OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. By: _________________________________