Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2908 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 8330 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2908 	By: Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House   
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma De partment of 
Corrections; requiring the expenditure of certain 
funds in certain amounts for certain purposes; 
requiring the transfer of certain amount to certain 
revolving fund; providing lapse dates; and requiring 
and prohibiting certain budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Departmen t of 
Corrections shall expend Eight Million Dollars ($8,000,000.00) to 
improve the correctional officer to inmate ratio at correctional 
facilities throughout the state.   
 
Req. No. 8330 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of 
Corrections shall expend Nine Million Two Hundred Forty Thousand 
Dollars ($9,240,000.00) for hepatitis C treatment. 
SECTION 3. From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of 
Corrections shall expend One Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars 
($1,800,000.00) for the purpose of funding a contractual per diem 
increase at the Lawton Correctional and Rehabilitation Facility. 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1 st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum of Nine Million 
Two Hundred Thirty-Five Thousand Two Hundred and Fifty -Eight Dollars 
($9,235,258.00) shall be transferred to the Department of 
Corrections Offender Management System Revolving Fund create d in 
Enrolled House Bill No. 2909 of the 1st Session of the 58th Oklahoma 
Legislature.  
SECTION 5.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (he reafter FY-22) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30,   
 
Req. No. 8330 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, a nd not budgeted for FY -23, shall 
lapse to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
 
58-1-8330 JM 05/17/21