Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2908 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2021

                            An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2908 	By: Wallace and Hilbert of the 
House   
 
   and 
 
  Thompson and Hall of the 
Senate   
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Department of 
Corrections; requiring the expenditure of certain 
funds in certain amounts for certain pur poses; 
requiring the transfer of certain amount to certain 
revolving fund; providing lapse dates; and requiring 
and prohibiting certain budget procedures. 
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Department of Corrections 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA : 
 
SECTION 1.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of 
Corrections shall expend Eight Million Dollars ($8,0 00,000.00) to 
improve the correctional officer to inmate ratio at correctional 
facilities throughout the state. 
 
SECTION 2.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of 
Corrections shall expend Nine Million Two Hundred Forty Thousand 
Dollars ($9,240,000.00) for hepatitis C treatment. 
 
SECTION 3.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the Department of 
Corrections shall expend One Million Eight Hundred Thousand Dollars  ENR. H. B. NO. 2908 	Page 2 
($1,800,000.00) for the purpose of funding a contractual per diem 
increase at the Lawton Correctional and Rehabilitation Facility. 
 
SECTION 4.  From the funds appropriated to the Oklahoma 
Department of Corrections in Enrolled House Bill No. 2900 of the 1st 
Session of the 58th Oklahoma Legislature, the sum o f Nine Million 
Two Hundred Thirty-five Thousand Two Hundred Fifty -eight Dollars 
($9,235,258.00) shall be transferred to the Department of 
Corrections Offender Management System Revolving Fund created in 
Enrolled House Bill No. 2909 of the 1st Session of th e 58th Oklahoma 
Legislature.  
 
SECTION 5.  Appropriations made by this act, not including 
appropriations made for capital outlay purposes, may be budgeted for 
the fiscal year ending June 30, 2022 (hereafter FY -22) or may be 
budgeted for the fiscal year end ing June 30, 2023 (hereafter FY -23).  
Funds budgeted for FY -22 may be encumbered only through June 30, 
2022, and must be expended by November 15, 2022.  Any funds 
remaining after November 15, 2022, and not budgeted for FY -23, shall 
lapse to the credit of t he proper fund for the then current fiscal 
year.  Funds budgeted for FY -23 may be encumbered only through June 
30, 2023.  Any funds remaining after November 15, 2023, shall lapse 
to the credit of the proper fund for the then current fiscal year.  
These appropriations may not be budgeted in both fiscal years 
simultaneously.  Funds budgeted in FY -22, and not required to pay 
obligations for that fiscal year, may be budgeted for FY -23, after 
the agency to which the funds have been appropriated has prepared 
and submitted a budget work program revision removing these funds 
from the FY-22 budget work program and after such revision has been 
approved by the Office of Management and Enterprise Services. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 2908 	Page 3 
Passed the House of Representatives the 18th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 20th day of May, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of _______________ ____, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________