Senate | 04/08/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative McCall, ODonnell |