House
|
04/26/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative West (Rick)
|
|
|