Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2022
Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2022

Amended

Bill March 31, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022