House
|
05/04/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/04/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Stark
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|