Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022