House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Energy
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Boles
|
|
|