Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB3039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 21, 2022
Bill March 21, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 11, 2022
Bill March 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022