House
|
04/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Authored by Representative Talley
|
|
|